IL SB2295 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on May 18 2018 - 75% progression
Action: 2018-05-18 - Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Terri Bryant
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Fish and Aquatic Life Code. Defines "fishing license" for purposes of the Act as an electronic or physical license authorizing the person to take a certain type of fish during a specified period of time. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

FISHING LICENSES

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-18 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-04-24 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-18HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Terri Bryant
2018-05-18HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony McCombie
2018-05-18HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond
2018-05-18SenatePassed Both Houses
2018-05-18HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 101-000-000
2018-05-16HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-16HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-09HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Severin
2018-05-09HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Monica Bristow
2018-05-09HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Avery Bourne
2018-05-09HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie Phelps Finnie
2018-05-09HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-08HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Agriculture & Conservation Committee; 016-000-000
2018-05-02HouseAssigned to Agriculture & Conservation Committee
2018-04-24HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-04-24HouseFirst Reading
2018-04-24HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Jerry Costello, II
2018-04-24HouseArrived in House
2018-04-24SenateThird Reading - Passed; 052-000-000
2018-04-24SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Kyle McCarter
2018-04-23SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 24, 2018
2018-04-23SenateSecond Reading
2018-04-12SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 17, 2018
2018-04-12SenateDo Pass as Amended Agriculture; 009-000-000
2018-04-12SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2018-03-14SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Agriculture
2018-03-09SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2018-03-09SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Julie A. Morrison
2018-01-24SenateAssigned to Agriculture
2018-01-10SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-01-10SenateFirst Reading
2018-01-10SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Julie A. Morrison

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
51551-51New CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback