IL SB2293 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 1 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-05-08 - Referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Vehicle Code. Provides that beginning with the 2020 registration year, the Secretary of State shall offer to each owner of a motor vehicle of the first division or motor vehicle of the second division weighing no more than 8,000 pounds a registration period based on a one calendar year or 2 calendar year basis. Provides that the Secretary shall offer to each owner of a motor vehicle of the first division that is a new vehicle or motor vehicle of the second division weighing no more than 8,000 pounds that is a new vehicle a registration period based on a one calendar year, 2 calendar year, or 5 calendar year basis. Provides that the owner of the motor vehicle shall pay the required registration fee under the Code that shall, if applicable, be increased to reflect the registration year period chosen by the motor vehicle owner.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

VEH CD-VEH REG-MULTI-YEAR

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-01 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-08HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-05-08HouseFirst Reading
2018-05-07HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Avery Bourne
2018-05-02HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Nick Sauer
2018-05-02HouseArrived in House
2018-05-01SenateThird Reading - Passed; 052-000-000
2018-05-01SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
2018-05-01SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; McConchie
2018-05-01SenateRecalled to Second Reading
2018-04-27SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 3, 2018
2018-04-24SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Transportation; 014-000-000
2018-04-23SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Transportation
2018-04-20SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2018-04-20SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Dan McConchie
2018-04-10SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 11, 2018
2018-04-10SenateSecond Reading
2018-03-14SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 10, 2018
2018-03-14SenateDo Pass Transportation; 018-000-000
2018-01-30SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Pamela J. Althoff
2018-01-30SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Karen McConnaughay
2018-01-24SenateAssigned to Transportation
2018-01-10SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-01-10SenateFirst Reading
2018-01-10SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Dan McConchie

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
62553-414.1Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback