IL SB2291 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-2)
Status: Passed on August 14 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-14 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0867
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Toll Highway Act. Requires the Board of Directors of the Illinois State Toll Highway Authority to post an agenda for each Board meeting on the Authority's public website and at the headquarters building of the Authority at least 2 business days in advance of the holding of the meeting. Provides that any agenda shall set forth the general subject matter of any issue that will be the subject of final action at the meeting and shall include specific details concerning contracts for projects entered into under the Act involving amounts over $100,000 that may be approved at the meeting, along with an Internet link to such details provided on the agenda posted at the Authority's headquarters building.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

TOLL HIGHWAY-BOARD MEETINGS

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-18 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 103 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-04-11 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-08-14SenatePublic Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0867
2018-08-14SenateEffective Date January 1, 2019
2018-08-14SenateGovernor Approved
2018-06-15SenateSent to the Governor
2018-05-18HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Al Riley
2018-05-18SenatePassed Both Houses
2018-05-18HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 103-000-000
2018-05-18HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry Lee Long
2018-05-18HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan
2018-05-16HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-16HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-10HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-10HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Tollway Oversight Committee; 005-000-000
2018-04-26HouseAssigned to Tollway Oversight Committee
2018-04-19SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Chris Nybo
2018-04-11HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-04-11HouseFirst Reading
2018-04-11HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Peter Breen
2018-04-11HouseArrived in House
2018-04-11SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Pamela J. Althoff
2018-04-11SenateThird Reading - Passed; 057-000-000
2018-04-10SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 11, 2018
2018-04-10SenateSecond Reading
2018-03-14SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 10, 2018
2018-03-14SenateDo Pass Transportation; 018-000-000
2018-01-30SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Karen McConnaughay
2018-01-24SenateAssigned to Transportation
2018-01-10SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-01-10SenateFirst Reading
2018-01-10SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Dan McConchie

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
605107.5Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback