IL SB2288 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-07-01 - Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Stalking No Contact Order Act and the Civil No Contact Order Act. Provides that an order issued under either of those Acts may require or recommend the respondent to undergo counseling for a specified duration with a social worker, psychologist, clinical psychologist, psychiatrist, family service agency, alcohol or substance abuse program, mental health center guidance counselor, agency providing services to elders, program designed for domestic violence abusers or any other guidance service the court deems appropriate. Provides that the court may order the respondent in any intimate partner relationship to report to an Illinois Department of Human Services protocol approved partner abuse intervention program for an assessment and to follow all recommended treatment.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

NO CONTACT ORDER-COUNSELING

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-07-01SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
2018-07-01SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
2018-07-01SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
2018-04-27SenateRule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2018-04-24SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Postponed - Criminal Law
2018-04-23SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Assignments Refers to Criminal Law
2018-04-19SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Assignments
2018-04-19SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Jil Tracy
2018-04-19SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt Criminal Law; 010-000-000
2018-04-19SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Criminal Law
2018-04-17SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Criminal Law
2018-04-10SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
2018-04-10SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Jil Tracy
2018-04-04SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Criminal Law
2018-03-29SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2018-03-29SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Jil Tracy
2018-02-22SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading February 27, 2018
2018-02-22SenateSecond Reading
2018-02-14SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading
2018-02-14SenateDo Pass Criminal Law; 010-000-000
2018-01-24SenateAssigned to Criminal Law
2018-01-10SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-01-10SenateFirst Reading
2018-01-10SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Jil Tracy

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
7402180Amended CodeCitation Text
74022213Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback