IL SB2286 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-05-03 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Liquor Control Act of 1934. Provides that a craft distiller may make sales and deliveries to importing distributors and distributors and may make sales and deliveries of up to 25,000 gallons of spirits to retail licensees per year. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

LIQUOR-CRAFT DISTILLERS

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-03SenateRule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2018-05-03SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2018-04-27SenateRule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 3, 2018
2018-04-13SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 27, 2018
2018-02-13SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-8(c-1) - Referred to Executive
2018-02-07SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. William E. Brady
2018-02-06SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2018-02-06SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Dan McConchie
2018-01-31SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Heather A. Steans
2018-01-24SenateAssigned to Executive
2018-01-10SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-01-10SenateFirst Reading
2018-01-10SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Dan McConchie

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
23555-1Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback