IL SB2286 | 2011-2012 | 97th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Criminal Code of 1961. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning the applicability of the common law.
Title
PARK DIST-EMPLOYING DELINQUENT
Sponsors
Sen. Arthur Wilhelmi [D] | Sen. Kirk Dillard [R] | Sen. Edward Maloney [D] | Rep. Darlene Senger [R] |
Sen. Michael Connelly [R] |
Roll Calls
2011-04-15 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 55 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-01-08 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2012-05-31 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40 |
2011-05-31 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2011-05-20 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 27, 2011 |
2011-05-13 | House | Committee Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b) May 20, 2011 |
2011-05-06 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael G. Connelly |
2011-05-06 | House | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Darlene J. Senger |
2011-05-03 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2011-05-03 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Michael G. Connelly |
2011-04-25 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2011-04-15 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2011-04-15 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Michael G. Connelly |
2011-04-15 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2011-04-15 | House | Arrived in House |
2011-04-15 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 055-001-001 |
2011-04-15 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Edward D. Maloney |
2011-04-11 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 12, 2011 |
2011-04-11 | Senate | Second Reading |
2011-03-17 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 29, 2011 |
2011-03-17 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Criminal Law; 006-001-001 |
2011-03-17 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2011-03-17 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Kirk W. Dillard |
2011-03-15 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Criminal Law |
2011-03-09 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2011-03-09 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. A. J. Wilhelmi |
2011-03-08 | Senate | Assigned to Criminal Law |
2011-02-10 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2011-02-10 | Senate | First Reading |
2011-02-10 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. A. J. Wilhelmi |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
720 | 5 | 1-3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |