IL SB2285 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Wildlife Code. Repeals provisions authorizing, under certain conditions, drainage districts to control beaver populations. Provides that a drainage district, road district or similar body, landowner, tenant, or the designee of a drainage district, road district, landowner, or tenant shall be exempt from the requirement to obtain a permit to control nuisance raccoons, opossums, muskrats, skunks, coyotes, or beavers if all applicable provisions for licenses are complied with and any trap types and sizes used are in compliance with the Act, including marking or identification. Provides that landowners, tenants, or their designees may remove cottontail rabbits or grey or fox squirrels from their property, but only by means of a live trap, if the cottontail rabbits and grey or fox squirrels are released alive and unharmed in suitable habitat that is not within any city or town and not within any park. Provides that the designee of a drainage district, road district, landowner, or tenant must have a signed and dated written authorization from the drainage district, landowner, or tenant in possession at all times when conducting animal control activities. Provides that the exemption from obtaining a permit shall be valid only upon property owned, leased, or controlled by the drainage district, road district, landowner, or tenant. Effective immediately.
Title
WILDLIFE CD-NUISANCE ANIMALS
Sponsors
Sen. Jil Tracy [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-13 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2020-05-15 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading/Passage Deadline Established As May 31, 2020 |
2020-05-07 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 29, 2020 |
2020-04-30 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 22, 2020 |
2020-04-23 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 15, 2020 |
2020-04-12 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2020-03-25 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 7, 2020 |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 18, 2020 |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Do Pass Agriculture; 009-000-000 |
2020-01-22 | Senate | Assigned to Agriculture |
2019-10-28 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-10-28 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-10-28 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Jil Tracy |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
520 | 5 | 2.37 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2285&GAID=15&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/SB/10100SB2285.htm |