IL SB2285 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on August 3 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-03 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0702
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Vehicle Code. Provides that the Secretary of State may issue a one-time decal or device to any non-resident of this State who is a person with disabilities and who is displaced from another jurisdiction due to a national disaster as declared by the federal government. Provides proof requirements for the temporary decal or device. Provides that the decal or device shall be valid for a period not to exceed 6 months. Effective January 1, 2019.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

VEH CD-TEMP DISABILITY DECAL

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-18 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 103 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-04-24 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-08-03SenatePublic Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0702
2018-08-03SenateEffective Date January 1, 2019
2018-08-03SenateGovernor Approved
2018-06-15SenateSent to the Governor
2018-05-18SenatePassed Both Houses
2018-05-18HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 103-000-000
2018-05-16HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-16HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-09HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-09HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee; 009-000-000
2018-05-02HouseAssigned to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee
2018-04-24HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-04-24HouseFirst Reading
2018-04-24HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez
2018-04-24HouseArrived in House
2018-04-24SenateThird Reading - Passed; 051-000-000
2018-04-24SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez
2018-04-19SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 23, 2018
2018-04-19SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Aquino
2018-04-19SenateRecalled to Second Reading
2018-04-17SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Transportation; 013-000-000
2018-04-17SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 18, 2018
2018-04-17SenateSecond Reading
2018-04-10SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Transportation
2018-04-06SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2018-04-06SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Omar Aquino
2018-03-14SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 10, 2018
2018-03-14SenateDo Pass Transportation; 018-000-000
2018-02-28SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy
2018-01-24SenateAssigned to Transportation
2018-01-10SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-01-10SenateFirst Reading
2018-01-10SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Omar Aquino

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
625511-1301.4Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback