IL SB2285 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on August 3 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-03 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0702
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on August 3 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-03 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0702
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Vehicle Code. Provides that the Secretary of State may issue a one-time decal or device to any non-resident of this State who is a person with disabilities and who is displaced from another jurisdiction due to a national disaster as declared by the federal government. Provides proof requirements for the temporary decal or device. Provides that the decal or device shall be valid for a period not to exceed 6 months. Effective January 1, 2019.
Title
VEH CD-TEMP DISABILITY DECAL
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-18 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 103 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-04-24 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-24 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-03 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0702 |
2018-08-03 | Senate | Effective Date January 1, 2019 |
2018-08-03 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2018-06-15 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2018-05-18 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2018-05-18 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 103-000-000 |
2018-05-16 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-16 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-09 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-09 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee; 009-000-000 |
2018-05-02 | House | Assigned to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee |
2018-04-24 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-04-24 | House | First Reading |
2018-04-24 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez |
2018-04-24 | House | Arrived in House |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 051-000-000 |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 23, 2018 |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Aquino |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2018-04-17 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Transportation; 013-000-000 |
2018-04-17 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 18, 2018 |
2018-04-17 | Senate | Second Reading |
2018-04-10 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Transportation |
2018-04-06 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2018-04-06 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Omar Aquino |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 10, 2018 |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Do Pass Transportation; 018-000-000 |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy |
2018-01-24 | Senate | Assigned to Transportation |
2018-01-10 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2018-01-10 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-01-10 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Omar Aquino |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
625 | 5 | 11-1301.4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |