IL SB2282 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Limitations on Actions for Negligent Hiring Act. Provides that a cause of action may not be brought against a party solely for hiring an employee or independent contractor who has been convicted of a nonviolent, non-sexual offense. Provides that in a negligent hiring action for the acts of an employee or independent contractor, the fact that the employee or independent contractor was convicted of a nonviolent, non-sexual offense before the beginning of the employee's or independent contractor's employment or contractual obligation may not be introduced into evidence. Provides that the new provisions do not preclude any existing cause of action for failure of an employer or other person to provide adequate supervision of an employee or independent contractor, except that the fact that the employee or independent contractor has been convicted of a nonviolent, non-sexual criminal offense may be introduced into evidence in the suit only if: (1) the employer knew of the conviction or was grossly negligent in not knowing of the conviction; and (2) the conviction was directly related to the nature of the employee's or independent contractor's work and the conduct that gave rise to the alleged injury that is the basis of the suit. Provides exceptions in certain situations.
Title
NEGLIGENT HIRING-LIMITATIONS
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-09 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2018-04-13 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Dale A. Righter |
2018-02-07 | Senate | To Subcommittee on Tort Reform |
2018-01-24 | Senate | Assigned to Judiciary |
2018-01-10 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2018-01-10 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-01-10 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Chuck Weaver |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2282&GAID=14&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB2282.htm |