IL SB2281 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Introduced on October 28 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-11-24 - Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Sara Feigenholtz
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Children with Disabilities Article of the School Code. Provides that a student whose 22nd birthday occurs during the school year is eligible for special education services through the end of the school year (rather than being eligible for services only until the day before his or her 22nd birthday). Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

SCH CD-SPECIAL ED-MAXIMUM AGE

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-11-24SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Sara Feigenholtz
2020-11-18SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura Ellman
2020-08-24SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes
2020-04-12SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
2020-04-12SenatePursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
2020-03-04SenatePostponed - Education
2020-03-04SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Education
2020-03-03SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Education
2020-02-28SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2020-02-28SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Bill Cunningham
2020-02-25SenatePostponed - Education
2020-02-07SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Rachelle Crowe
2020-02-06SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt
2020-02-05SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins
2020-02-05SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Patrick J. Joyce
2020-02-05SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Steven M. Landek
2020-02-05SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez
2020-02-05SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy
2020-02-04SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison
2020-01-22SenateAssigned to Education
2019-10-28SenateReferred to Assignments
2019-10-28SenateFirst Reading
2019-10-28SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Bill Cunningham

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
105514-1.02Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback