IL SB2281 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 12 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-04-13 - Referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Department of Commerce and Economic Opportunity Law of the Civil Administrative Code of Illinois. Provides that the purpose of the Entrepreneur Learner's Permit pilot program is to encourage and assist beginning entrepreneurs in starting new businesses (instead of "new information services, biotechnology, and green technology businesses"). Removes provisions limiting the aggregate amount of all reimbursements under the Entrepreneur Learner's Permit pilot program to $500,000 per State fiscal year. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

DCEO-ENTREPRENEUR PERMIT

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-12 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-13HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-04-13HouseFirst Reading
2018-04-12HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Carol Sente
2018-04-12HouseArrived in House
2018-04-12SenateThird Reading - Passed; 056-000-000
2018-04-10SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 11, 2018
2018-04-10SenateSecond Reading
2018-03-01SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 13, 2018
2018-03-01SenateDo Pass as Amended Commerce and Economic Development; 009-000-000
2018-03-01SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2018-02-27SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Commerce and Economic Development
2018-02-26SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2018-02-26SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Dale A. Righter
2018-01-24SenateAssigned to Commerce and Economic Development
2018-01-10SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-01-10SenateFirst Reading
2018-01-10SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Dale A. Righter

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
20605605-1020Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback