IL SB2281 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-6)
Status: Enrolled on May 30 2018 - 75% progression
Action: 2018-05-30 - Passed Both Houses
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Department of Commerce and Economic Opportunity Law of the Civil Administrative Code of Illinois. Provides that the purpose of the Entrepreneur Learner's Permit pilot program is to encourage and assist beginning entrepreneurs in starting new businesses (instead of "new information services, biotechnology, and green technology businesses"). Removes provisions limiting the aggregate amount of all reimbursements under the Entrepreneur Learner's Permit pilot program to $500,000 per State fiscal year. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

DCEO-ENTREPRENEUR PERMIT

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-30 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-18 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 103 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-04-12 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-30SenatePassed Both Houses
2018-05-30SenateSenate Concurs
2018-05-30SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 057-000-000
2018-05-29SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Commerce and Economic Development; 008-000-000
2018-05-28SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Commerce and Economic Development
2018-05-28SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments
2018-05-28SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Dale A. Righter
2018-05-21SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 - May 22, 2018
2018-05-21SenateSecretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1
2018-05-18HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 103-000-000
2018-05-16HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-16HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2018-05-16HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-14HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000
2018-05-11HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
2018-05-10HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-05-10HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Carol Sente
2018-05-09HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-08HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Economic Opportunity Committee; 012-000-000
2018-05-08HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Nick Sauer
2018-05-08HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. André Thapedi
2018-05-08HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Anthony DeLuca
2018-05-08HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford
2018-05-08HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy
2018-05-08HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Sam Yingling
2018-05-08HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez
2018-05-08HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield
2018-05-08HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Steven A. Andersson
2018-05-08HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Keith R. Wheeler
2018-05-08HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Juliana Stratton
2018-05-08HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Litesa E. Wallace
2018-05-08HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper
2018-05-08HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia
2018-05-08HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Monica Bristow
2018-05-08HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael Halpin
2018-05-08HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark Batinick
2018-05-08HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller
2018-05-08HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sheri Jesiel
2018-05-08HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry Costello, II
2018-04-26HouseAssigned to Economic Opportunity Committee
2018-04-13HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-04-13HouseFirst Reading
2018-04-12HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Carol Sente
2018-04-12HouseArrived in House
2018-04-12SenateThird Reading - Passed; 056-000-000
2018-04-10SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 11, 2018
2018-04-10SenateSecond Reading
2018-03-01SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 13, 2018
2018-03-01SenateDo Pass as Amended Commerce and Economic Development; 009-000-000
2018-03-01SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2018-02-27SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Commerce and Economic Development
2018-02-26SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2018-02-26SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Dale A. Righter
2018-01-24SenateAssigned to Commerce and Economic Development
2018-01-10SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-01-10SenateFirst Reading
2018-01-10SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Dale A. Righter

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
20605605-1020Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback