IL SB2279 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-25 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0040
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Reinserts the provisions of the engrossed bill with changes. Removes provisions from the bill that amend the Property Tax Code. Makes changes concerning statutes of limitations for issuing a notice of tax liability. Further amends the Illinois Income Tax Act. Provides that, when a taxpayer sells or transfers the major part of (i) the stock of goods which he is engaged in the business of selling, (ii) furniture or fixtures, (iii) machinery and equipment, or (iv) real property, then the taxpayer shall notify the Department of Revenue (currently, the Chicago office of the Department of Revenue) no more than 10 business days before (currently, after) the sale or transfer. Provides that payments of winnings from sports wagering conducted in accordance with the Sports Wagering Act are allocable to this State. In provisions concerning the Economic Development for a Growing Economy (EDGE) Tax Credit, provides that, if, during any taxable year, a taxpayer ceases operations at a project location that is the subject of an EDGE agreement with the intent to terminate operations in the State, then the taxpayer's State income tax liability shall be increased by the amount of any credit allowed prior to the date the taxpayer ceases operations. Adds provisions to the engrossed bill amending the Tobacco Products Tax Act of 1995. Provides that the definition of "electronic cigarette" does not include a device designed solely for use with cannabis or a device that contains a solution or substance that contains cannabis subject to tax under the Compassionate Use of Medical Cannabis Program Act or the Cannabis Regulation and Tax Act. Provides that the changes made by this amendatory Act apply on and after June 28, 2020. Amends the Local Government Revenue Recapture Act. Provides that a niece, nephew, great-niece, or great-nephew is considered a "family member" for purposes of the Act. Makes changes concerning circumstances under which a third party may access a municipality's or county's financial information. In provisions concerning third party aggregated data, provides that no aggregated data may be published that includes taxpayer information for 4 or fewer taxpayers. Makes other changes. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

REVENUE-VARIOUS

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-31 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 41 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-31 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 41 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-30 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 74 N: 40 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-22 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 40 N: 15 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-25SenatePublic Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0040
2021-06-25SenateEffective Date June 25, 2021
2021-06-25SenateGovernor Approved
2021-06-15SenateSent to the Governor
2021-05-31SenatePassed Both Houses
2021-05-31SenateSenate Concurs
2021-05-31SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Senate Concurs 041-018-000
2021-05-31SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 041-018-000
2021-05-31SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt State Government; 006-003-000
2021-05-31SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt State Government; 006-003-000
2021-05-31SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to State Government
2021-05-31SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to State Government
2021-05-30SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments
2021-05-30SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Steve Stadelman
2021-05-30SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments
2021-05-30SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Steve Stadelman
2021-05-30SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1, 2 - May 31, 2021
2021-05-30SenateSecretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1, 2
2021-05-30HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 074-040-000
2021-05-30HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2021-05-30HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted
2021-05-30HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2021-05-29HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Revenue & Finance Committee; 011-007-000
2021-05-28HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2021
2021-05-28HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Revenue & Finance Committee
2021-05-27HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
2021-05-27HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Zalewski
2021-05-26HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
2021-05-26HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2021-05-26HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Revenue & Finance Committee; 011-007-000
2021-05-26HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Revenue & Finance Committee
2021-05-25HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2021-05-25HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Zalewski
2021-05-13HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2021-05-13HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Revenue & Finance Committee; 011-007-000
2021-05-04HouseAssigned to Revenue & Finance Committee
2021-04-23HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2021-04-23HouseFirst Reading
2021-04-23HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Zalewski
2021-04-23HouseArrived in House
2021-04-22SenateThird Reading - Passed; 040-015-000
2021-04-20SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 21, 2021
2021-04-20SenateSecond Reading
2021-04-15SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 20, 2021
2021-04-15SenateDo Pass Revenue; 008-001-000
2021-03-23SenateAssigned to Revenue
2021-02-26SenateReferred to Assignments
2021-02-26SenateFirst Reading
2021-02-26SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Steve Stadelman

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
2025052505-380Amended CodeCitation Text
20250539b47Amended CodeCitation Text
23558-3Amended CodeCitation Text
301055.935New CodeSee Bill Text
3510521Amended CodeCitation Text
3511519Amended CodeCitation Text
351202aAmended CodeCitation Text
351206Amended CodeCitation Text
351281-55Amended CodeCitation Text
351309dAmended CodeCitation Text
3513514aAmended CodeCitation Text
3520011-25Amended CodeCitation Text
3520016-180Amended CodeCitation Text
355905Amended CodeCitation Text
356106Amended CodeCitation Text
356156Amended CodeCitation Text
356206Amended CodeCitation Text
356256Amended CodeCitation Text
3563010Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2279&GAID=16&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=110&GA=102
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/SB/10200SB2279.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/SB/10200SB2279eng.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/SB/10200SB2279enr.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/publicacts/102/102-0040.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/SB/10200SB2279ham001.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/SB/10200SB2279ham002.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/102/senate/10200SB2279_04222021_066000T.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/102/house/10200SB2279_05302021_005000T.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/102/senate/10200SB2279ham002_05312021_015001C.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/102/senate/10200SB2279ham001_05312021_015000C.pdf

Bill Comments 750

feedback