IL SB2278 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 13 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-13 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0835
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Missing Persons Identification Act. Provides that the definition of "high-risk missing person" includes a person who is a veteran or active duty member of the United States Armed Forces, the National Guard, or any reserve component of the United States Armed Forces who is believed to have a physical or mental health condition that is related to his or her service.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

MISSING PERSONS-VETERANS

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-18 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 103 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-02-21 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-08-13SenatePublic Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0835
2018-08-13SenateEffective Date January 1, 2019
2018-08-13SenateGovernor Approved
2018-06-15SenateSent to the Governor
2018-05-18HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony McCombie
2018-05-18HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond
2018-05-18HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood
2018-05-18SenatePassed Both Houses
2018-05-18HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 103-000-000
2018-05-18HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll
2018-05-16HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-16HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-10HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Charles Meier
2018-05-10HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Avery Bourne
2018-05-10HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Frances Ann Hurley
2018-05-10HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael P. McAuliffe
2018-05-10HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie Phelps Finnie
2018-05-10HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry Costello, II
2018-05-10HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael Halpin
2018-05-10HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia
2018-05-10HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit
2018-05-10HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah
2018-05-10HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Steven Reick
2018-05-10HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford
2018-05-10HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Terri Bryant
2018-05-10HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael D. Unes
2018-05-10HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-10HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Veterans' Affairs Committee; 011-000-000
2018-05-09HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. John M. Cabello
2018-05-09HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Brian W. Stewart
2018-04-26HouseAssigned to Veterans' Affairs Committee
2018-04-12SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Neil Anderson
2018-03-28SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael E. Hastings
2018-02-27SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy
2018-02-27HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-02-27HouseFirst Reading
2018-02-21HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Daniel Swanson
2018-02-21HouseArrived in House
2018-02-21SenateThird Reading - Passed; 050-000-000
2018-02-20SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading February 21, 2018
2018-02-20SenateSecond Reading
2018-01-30SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading January 30, 2018
2018-01-30SenateDo Pass Veterans Affairs; 007-000-000
2018-01-30SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Paul Schimpf
2018-01-30SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Thomas Cullerton
2018-01-24SenateAssigned to Veterans Affairs
2018-01-10SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-01-10SenateFirst Reading
2018-01-10SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Pamela J. Althoff

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
5072210Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback