IL SB2277 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 23 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-15 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Code of Criminal Procedure of 1963. Provides that the duration of a civil no contact order is permanent if a judgment of conviction for criminal sexual assault is entered.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

NO CONTACT ORDER-SEX CRIMES

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-23 - Senate - Motion in Senate (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-15HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2021-05-04HouseAssigned to Executive Committee
2021-04-30SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Sara Feigenholtz
2021-04-29SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mike Simmons
2021-04-28SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford
2021-04-28SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Doris Turner
2021-04-28HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2021-04-28HouseFirst Reading
2021-04-27HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. David A. Welter
2021-04-26HouseArrived in House
2021-04-23SenateThird Reading - Passed; 058-000-000
2021-04-23SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Rachelle Crowe
2021-04-20SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading ** April 21, 2021
2021-04-20SenateSecond Reading
2021-04-14SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 15, 2021
2021-04-14SenateDo Pass Criminal Law; 010-000-000
2021-04-07SenateAssigned to Criminal Law
2021-02-26SenateReferred to Assignments
2021-02-26SenateFirst Reading
2021-02-26SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Steve Stadelman

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
7255112A-20Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback