IL SB2277 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends Regional Transportation Authority Act. Provides that Metra Electric District Line and Rock Island District Line fares for transportation wholly within the City of Chicago shall be equal to the fares set by the Chicago Transit Board for rail transportation. Provides that fares for Electric District Line and Rock Island District Line transportation that originates or concludes outside of the City of Chicago shall be set by the Commuter Rail Board and be based on the zone in which the transportation originates and concludes. Provides that the Commuter Rail Board shall accept the Ventra card for use on the Electric District and Rock Island District Lines and riders using the Ventra card shall pay through the Ventra application or at a station. Provides that the Commuter Rail Board shall adopt a policy to periodically check riders' tickets, including Ventra tickets, on the Electric District and Rock Island District Lines to determine whether a rider has paid for transportation at the station or on the Ventra application. Provides that lost revenue experienced by the Commuter Rail Board due to the implementation of any requirement relating to specified Electric District Line and Rock Island District Line fare provisions are not "costs" in the calculation of whether fares and charges received in each fiscal year equal at least 50% of the aggregate costs of providing public transportation. Effective immediately.
Title
METRA ELECTRIC & ROCK ISLAND
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-13 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2019-11-14 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Pat McGuire |
2019-10-28 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-10-28 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-10-28 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Bill Cunningham |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
70 | 3615 | 3B.09c | New Code | See Bill Text |
70 | 3615 | 4.01 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
70 | 3615 | 4.09 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2277&GAID=15&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/SB/10100SB2277.htm |