IL SB2276 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-05-03 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the State Officials and Employees Ethics Act. Provides that the Legislative Ethics Commission shall adopt no rule requiring the Legislative Inspector General to seek the Commission's advance approval before commencing any investigation. Provides that any existing rule, as of the effective date of this amendatory Act, requiring the Legislative Inspector General to seek the Commission's advance approval before commencing any investigation is void. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

LIG-ETHICS INVESTIGATIONS

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-03SenateRule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2018-04-27SenateRule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 3, 2018
2018-04-13SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 27, 2018
2018-01-30SenateTo Subcommittee on Special Issues (EX)
2018-01-25SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Karen McConnaughay
2018-01-24SenateAssigned to Executive
2018-01-17SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison
2018-01-10SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Thomas Cullerton
2018-01-10SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Tim Bivins
2018-01-10SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy
2018-01-10SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Heather A. Steans
2018-01-10SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-01-10SenateFirst Reading
2018-01-10SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Cristina Castro

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
543025-15Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback