IL SB2275 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Flavored Tobacco Ban Act. Prohibits the sale or distribution by an establishment of any flavored tobacco product. Provides that the Department of Public Health shall enforce the Act and may adopt rules or guidelines for the implementation and enforcement of the Act. Amends the Department of Public Health Powers and Duties Law of the Civil Administrative Code of Illinois. Requires the Department of Public Health to develop warning labels regarding the health risks of electronic cigarettes to be displayed at each retailer where any electronic cigarette product is sold and in any electronic cigarette advertisement. Provides that the Department shall adopt rules for the implementation and enforcement of the provisions. Amends the Tobacco Products Tax Act of 1995. Permits the Department of Revenue to suspend the license of any distributor that violates the Flavored Tobacco Ban Act. Effective immediately.
Title
FLAVORED TOBACCO BAN
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-13 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2021-01-10 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Emil Jones, III |
2020-01-14 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2019-10-28 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-10-28 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-10-28 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Julie A. Morrison |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
20 | 2310 | 2310-437 | New Code | See Bill Text |
35 | 143 | 10-25 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2275&GAID=15&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/SB/10100SB2275.htm |