IL SB2275 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-05-18 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Creates the Marijuana Legalization Referendum Act. Requires the State Board of Elections to cause a statewide advisory public question to be submitted to the voters at the November 6, 2018 general election asking whether individuals support the legalization of possession and use of marijuana by persons who are at least 21 years of age, subject to regulation and taxation that is similar to the regulation and taxation of tobacco and alcohol. Provides that if a provision of the Act conflicts with any other law, the Act controls. Repeals the Act on January 1, 2019. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

PUBLIC QUESTION-MARIJUANA

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-01 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 37 N: 13 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-18HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2018-04-09HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch
2018-03-21HouseAssigned to Executive Committee
2018-03-01SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt
2018-03-01HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-03-01HouseFirst Reading
2018-03-01HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Frances Ann Hurley
2018-03-01HouseArrived in House
2018-03-01SenateThird Reading - Passed; 037-013-001
2018-03-01SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson
2018-03-01SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Daniel Biss
2018-02-28SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy
2018-02-22SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading February 27, 2018
2018-02-22SenateSecond Reading
2018-02-21SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading February 22, 2018
2018-02-21SenateDo Pass Executive; 011-004-000
2018-01-30SenatePostponed - Executive
2018-01-24SenateAssigned to Executive
2018-01-10SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-01-10SenateFirst Reading
2018-01-10SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Bill Cunningham

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback