IL SB2275 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Marijuana Legalization Referendum Act. Requires the State Board of Elections to cause a statewide advisory public question to be submitted to the voters at the November 6, 2018 general election asking whether individuals support the legalization of possession and use of marijuana by persons who are at least 21 years of age, subject to regulation and taxation that is similar to the regulation and taxation of tobacco and alcohol. Provides that if a provision of the Act conflicts with any other law, the Act controls. Repeals the Act on January 1, 2019. Effective immediately.
Title
PUBLIC QUESTION-MARIJUANA
Sponsors
Sen. William Cunningham [D] | Sen. Laura Murphy [D] | Sen. Daniel Biss [D] | Sen. Toi Hutchinson [D] |
Sen. Patricia Van Pelt [D] | Rep. Frances Hurley [D] | Rep. Emanuel Welch [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-03-01 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 37 N: 13 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-09 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2018-11-07 | House | Assigned to Elections & Campaign Finance Committee |
2018-05-18 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2018-04-09 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2018-03-21 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt |
2018-03-01 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-03-01 | House | First Reading |
2018-03-01 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Frances Ann Hurley |
2018-03-01 | House | Arrived in House |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 037-013-001 |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Daniel Biss |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading February 27, 2018 |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Second Reading |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading February 22, 2018 |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Do Pass Executive; 011-004-000 |
2018-01-30 | Senate | Postponed - Executive |
2018-01-24 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2018-01-10 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2018-01-10 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-01-10 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Bill Cunningham |