IL SB2273 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 43-0)
Status: Vetoed on July 17 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-17 - Governor Vetoed
Text: Latest bill text (Veto Message) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Election Code. Provides that the Electronic Registration Information Center shall provide the exclusive interstate voter registration program for the State. Provides that the State Board of Elections shall not share identification records contained in databases maintained by State agencies with any interstate voter registration program other than the Electronic Registration Information Center. Amends the State Mandates Act to require implementation without reimbursement. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

ELECTION CD-ELECTRONIC REGISTR

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-19 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 63 N: 49 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-01-31 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 35 N: 17 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-07-17SenateGovernor Vetoed
2018-05-18SenateSent to the Governor
2018-05-09SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson
2018-04-19SenatePassed Both Houses
2018-04-19HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 063-049-000
2018-04-18HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-18HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-16HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel
2018-04-16HouseFiscal Note Filed
2018-04-12HouseFiscal Note Requested by Rep. Tom Demmer
2018-04-11HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-11HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Elections & Campaign Finance Committee; 010-005-000
2018-04-09HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Feigenholtz
2018-04-06HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez
2018-04-06HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley
2018-04-06HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman
2018-04-04HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Silvana Tabares
2018-04-04HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Frances Ann Hurley
2018-04-03HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi
2018-04-03HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia
2018-04-03HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Lou Lang
2018-04-03HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr.
2018-04-03HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Gregory Harris
2018-04-03HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Zalewski
2018-04-03HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Fine
2018-04-03HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter
2018-04-03HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. John Connor
2018-04-03HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Sam Yingling
2018-03-07HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie
2018-03-07HouseAssigned to Elections & Campaign Finance Committee
2018-02-27SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy
2018-02-07HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Lawrence Walsh, Jr.
2018-02-05HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-02-05HouseFirst Reading
2018-02-02HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons
2018-01-31SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Terry Link
2018-01-31HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Ann M. Williams
2018-01-31HouseArrived in House
2018-01-31SenateThird Reading - Passed; 035-017-001
2018-01-31SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins
2018-01-31SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Emil Jones, III
2018-01-30SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading January 31, 2018
2018-01-30SenateSecond Reading
2018-01-30SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading January 30, 2018
2018-01-30SenateDo Pass as Amended Executive; 009-006-000
2018-01-30SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2018-01-30SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Executive
2018-01-30SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2018-01-30SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Kwame Raoul
2018-01-29SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro
2018-01-26SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter
2018-01-26SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. John J. Cullerton
2018-01-24SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Omar Aquino
2018-01-24SenateAssigned to Executive
2018-01-24SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Pat McGuire
2018-01-23SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Heather A. Steans
2018-01-18SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Daniel Biss
2018-01-17SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Andy Manar
2018-01-17SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes
2018-01-17SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez
2018-01-10SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Thomas Cullerton
2018-01-10SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. David Koehler
2018-01-10SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael E. Hastings
2018-01-10SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Jennifer Bertino-Tarrant
2018-01-10SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Don Harmon
2018-01-10SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-01-10SenateFirst Reading
2018-01-10SenateChief Co-Sponsor Sen. Bill Cunningham
2018-01-10SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Kwame Raoul

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1051A-45Amended CodeCitation Text
308058.42New CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback