IL SB2273 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 43-0)
Status: Failed on November 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-11-28 - Total Veto Stands
Text: Latest bill text (Veto Message) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 43-0)
Status: Failed on November 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-11-28 - Total Veto Stands
Text: Latest bill text (Veto Message) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Election Code. Provides that the Electronic Registration Information Center shall provide the exclusive interstate voter registration program for the State. Provides that the State Board of Elections shall not share identification records contained in databases maintained by State agencies with any interstate voter registration program other than the Electronic Registration Information Center. Amends the State Mandates Act to require implementation without reimbursement. Effective immediately.
Title
ELECTION CD-ELECTRONIC REGISTR
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-11-14 - Senate - Motion in Senate (Y: 35 N: 21 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-19 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 63 N: 49 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-01-31 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 35 N: 17 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-19 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 63 N: 49 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-01-31 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 35 N: 17 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-11-28 | Senate | Total Veto Stands |
2018-11-14 | Senate | Override Governor Veto - Senate Lost 035-021-000 |
2018-11-14 | Senate | 3/5 Vote Required |
2018-11-14 | Senate | Motion Filed Override Governor Veto Sen. Kwame Raoul |
2018-11-13 | Senate | Placed Calendar Total Veto November 14, 2018 |
2018-07-17 | Senate | Governor Vetoed |
2018-05-18 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2018-04-19 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 063-049-000 |
2018-04-18 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-18 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-16 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel |
2018-04-16 | House | Fiscal Note Filed |
2018-04-12 | House | Fiscal Note Requested by Rep. Tom Demmer |
2018-04-11 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-11 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Elections & Campaign Finance Committee; 010-005-000 |
2018-04-09 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Feigenholtz |
2018-04-06 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez |
2018-04-06 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley |
2018-04-06 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman |
2018-04-04 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Silvana Tabares |
2018-04-04 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Frances Ann Hurley |
2018-04-03 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi |
2018-04-03 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia |
2018-04-03 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Lou Lang |
2018-04-03 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr. |
2018-04-03 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Gregory Harris |
2018-04-03 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Zalewski |
2018-04-03 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Fine |
2018-04-03 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter |
2018-04-03 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. John Connor |
2018-04-03 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Sam Yingling |
2018-03-07 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie |
2018-03-07 | House | Assigned to Elections & Campaign Finance Committee |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy |
2018-02-07 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Lawrence Walsh, Jr. |
2018-02-05 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-02-05 | House | First Reading |
2018-02-02 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons |
2018-01-31 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Terry Link |
2018-01-31 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Ann M. Williams |
2018-01-31 | House | Arrived in House |
2018-01-31 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 035-017-001 |
2018-01-31 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2018-01-31 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Emil Jones, III |
2018-01-30 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading January 31, 2018 |
2018-01-30 | Senate | Second Reading |
2018-01-30 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading January 30, 2018 |
2018-01-30 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Executive; 009-006-000 |
2018-01-30 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2018-01-30 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Executive |
2018-01-30 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2018-01-30 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Kwame Raoul |
2018-01-29 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro |
2018-01-26 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter |
2018-01-26 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. John J. Cullerton |
2018-01-24 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Omar Aquino |
2018-01-24 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2018-01-24 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Pat McGuire |
2018-01-23 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Heather A. Steans |
2018-01-18 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Daniel Biss |
2018-01-17 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Andy Manar |
2018-01-17 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes |
2018-01-17 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez |
2018-01-10 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Thomas Cullerton |
2018-01-10 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. David Koehler |
2018-01-10 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael E. Hastings |
2018-01-10 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Jennifer Bertino-Tarrant |
2018-01-10 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Don Harmon |
2018-01-10 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2018-01-10 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-01-10 | Senate | Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Bill Cunningham |
2018-01-10 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Kwame Raoul |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
10 | 5 | 1A-45 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
30 | 805 | 8.42 | New Code | See Bill Text |