IL SB2272 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on February 26 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-07 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 26 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-07 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Clinical Psychologist Licensing Act. In provisions concerning clinical training requirements for a prescribing psychologist license, makes changes to facility requirements for that clinical training. In language providing that a written delegation of prescriptive authority by a collaborating physician may only include medications for the treatment of mental health disease or illness the collaborating physician generally provides to his or her patients in the normal course of his or her clinical practice, deletes an exception for patients who are less than 17 years of age or over 65 years of age. In a provision concerning the delegation of prescriptive authority, removes language providing that no Schedule II controlled substance shall be delegated. Effective immediately.
Title
PRESCRIBING PSYCHOLOGIST
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-07 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2021-04-30 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 7, 2021 |
2021-04-23 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As April 30, 2021 |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 15, 2021 |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Do Pass Behavioral and Mental Health; 010-000-000 |
2021-04-09 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Melinda Bush |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Assigned to Behavioral and Mental Health |
2021-03-01 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Bill Cunningham |
2021-02-26 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2021-02-26 | Senate | First Reading |
2021-02-26 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Dave Syverson |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
225 | 15 | 4.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 15 | 4.3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2272&GAID=16&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=110&GA=102 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/SB/10200SB2272.htm |