IL SB2272 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-05-03 - Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Criminal Code of 2012. Provides that a person also commits aggravated battery when, in committing a battery, other than by the discharge of a firearm, he or she knowingly causes great bodily harm or permanent disability or disfigurement to an individual whom the person knows to be a Department of Children and Family Services employee: (1) performing his or her official duties; (2) battered to prevent performance of his or her official duties; or (3) battered in retaliation for performing his or her official duties. Provides that a violation is a Class 1 felony. Provides that a person also commits aggravated battery when, in committing a battery, other than by discharge of a firearm, he or she knows the individual battered to be a Department of Children and Family Services employee: (1) performing his or her official duties; (2) battered to prevent performance of his or her official duties; or (3) battered in retaliation for performing his or her official duties. Provides that a violation is a Class 2 felony.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

CRIM CD-AGG BAT DCFS EMPLOYEE

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-03SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2018-05-03SenateRule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2018-05-02SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 3, 2018
2018-05-02SenateDo Pass Criminal Law; 008-000-003
2018-05-02SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Criminal Law
2018-05-02SenateReported Back To Criminal Law; 003-000-000
2018-05-02SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Reported Back To Criminal Law
2018-05-01SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Neil Anderson
2018-05-01SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 To Subcommittee on CLEAR Compliance
2018-05-01SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Criminal Law
2018-04-27SenateRule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 3, 2018
2018-04-26SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2018-04-26SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Tim Bivins
2018-04-13SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 27, 2018
2018-02-14SenateTo Subcommittee on CLEAR Compliance
2018-02-13SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Melinda Bush
2018-01-24SenateAssigned to Criminal Law
2018-01-10SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-01-10SenateFirst Reading
2018-01-10SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Tim Bivins

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
720512-3.05Amended CodeCitation Text
720512-4Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback