IL SB2271 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-2)
Status: Passed on August 21 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-21 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-1010
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-2)
Status: Passed on August 21 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-21 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-1010
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Criminal Code of 2012. Provides that a prosecution for any offense involving sexual conduct or sexual penetration in which the victim was 18 years of age or older at the time of the offense may be commenced within one year after the offense is discovered by the victim. Provides that the charging document shall state the reason why the offense was not discovered by the victim within the general limitation period provided in the Code.
Title
CRIM CD-SEX OFFENSE-LIMITATION
Sponsors
Sen. Jil Tracy [R] | Sen. Melinda Bush [D] | Sen. Michael Connelly [R] | Sen. Iris Martinez [D] |
Sen. John Curran [R] | Rep. Randy Frese [R] | Rep. Patricia Bellock [R] | Rep. Grant Wehrli [R] |
Rep. Tony McCombie [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-05-25 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 106 N: 3 NV: 3 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-05-10 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-10 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-21 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-1010 |
2018-08-21 | Senate | Effective Date January 1, 2019 |
2018-08-21 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2018-07-19 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. John F. Curran |
2018-06-22 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2018-05-25 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Patricia R. Bellock |
2018-05-25 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Grant Wehrli |
2018-05-25 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2018-05-25 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 106-003-002 |
2018-05-24 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-23 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-23 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-23 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez |
2018-05-23 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-22 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 013-000-000 |
2018-05-17 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony McCombie |
2018-05-14 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2018-05-14 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-05-14 | House | First Reading |
2018-05-11 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Randy E. Frese |
2018-05-10 | House | Arrived in House |
2018-05-10 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 050-000-000 |
2018-05-10 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2018-05-10 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Tracy |
2018-05-10 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2018-05-10 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael Connelly |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt Criminal Law; 009-000-000 |
2018-05-08 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Criminal Law |
2018-05-08 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 9, 2018 |
2018-05-08 | Senate | Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2018-05-08 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 11, 2018 |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2018-04-27 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 3, 2018 |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Melinda Bush |
2018-03-13 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-8(b-1), this amendment will remain in the Committee on Assignments. |
2018-03-12 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments |
2018-03-12 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Jil Tracy |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading February 27, 2018 |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Second Reading |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Do Pass Criminal Law; 008-000-000 |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Jil Tracy |
2018-01-24 | Senate | Assigned to Criminal Law |
2018-01-10 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2018-01-10 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-01-10 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Jil Tracy |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
720 | 5 | 3-6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |