IL SB2270 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Passed on August 7 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-07 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0740
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Passed on August 7 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-07 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0740
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Animal Control Act. Provides that every owner of a cat, that is 4 months or more of age, shall have each cat inoculated against rabies by a licensed veterinarian. Exempts feral cats. Provides that veterinarians who inoculate a cat shall procure from the County Animal Control in the county where their office is located serially numbered tags, one to be issued with each inoculation certificate. Provides that the county board shall cause a rabies inoculation tag to be issued, at a fee established by the county board for each cat inoculated against rabies.
Title
RABIES VACCINES-CATS
Sponsors
Sen. Linda Holmes [D] | Sen. Thomas Cullerton [D] | Sen. Cristina Castro [D] | Sen. Sara Feigenholtz [D] |
Rep. David Olsen [R] | Rep. Allen Skillicorn [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-05-30 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 52 N: 3 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-24 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 107 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-04-24 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-24 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 107 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-04-24 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-07 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0740 |
2018-08-07 | Senate | Effective Date January 1, 2019 |
2018-08-07 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2018-06-28 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2018-05-30 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro |
2018-05-30 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Thomas Cullerton |
2018-05-30 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2018-05-30 | Senate | Senate Concurs |
2018-05-30 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 052-003-000 |
2018-05-29 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Agriculture; 010-000-000 |
2018-05-28 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Agriculture |
2018-05-25 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments |
2018-05-25 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Linda Holmes |
2018-05-25 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 - May 28, 2018 |
2018-05-25 | Senate | Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 |
2018-05-24 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 107-000-000 |
2018-05-24 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. David S. Olsen |
2018-05-22 | Senate | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Linda Holmes |
2018-05-21 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-21 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-18 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-17 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Allen Skillicorn |
2018-05-17 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Executive Committee; 009-000-000 |
2018-05-17 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Executive Committee; by Voice Vote |
2018-05-16 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Executive Committee |
2018-05-15 | House | In line by 3PM. Timely filed in accordance with House Rule 18(e). |
2018-05-15 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-05-15 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Sara Feigenholtz |
2018-05-02 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2018-04-24 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-04-24 | House | First Reading |
2018-04-24 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Sara Feigenholtz |
2018-04-24 | House | Arrived in House |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a) |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 053-000-000 |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 24, 2018 |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Second Reading |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 23, 2018 |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Agriculture; 008-000-000 |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Adopted |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Agriculture |
2018-04-17 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Agriculture |
2018-04-13 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments |
2018-04-13 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Jil Tracy |
2018-04-13 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 27, 2018 |
2018-04-12 | Senate | Postponed - Agriculture |
2018-04-12 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Agriculture |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Agriculture |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Postponed - Agriculture |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Jil Tracy |
2018-01-24 | Senate | Assigned to Agriculture |
2018-01-10 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2018-01-10 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-01-10 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Jil Tracy |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
510 | 5 | 8 | Amended Code | Citation Text |