IL SB2270 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Passed on August 7 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-07 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0740
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Animal Control Act. Provides that every owner of a cat, that is 4 months or more of age, shall have each cat inoculated against rabies by a licensed veterinarian. Exempts feral cats. Provides that veterinarians who inoculate a cat shall procure from the County Animal Control in the county where their office is located serially numbered tags, one to be issued with each inoculation certificate. Provides that the county board shall cause a rabies inoculation tag to be issued, at a fee established by the county board for each cat inoculated against rabies.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

RABIES VACCINES-CATS

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-30 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 52 N: 3 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-24 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 107 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-04-24 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-08-07SenatePublic Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0740
2018-08-07SenateEffective Date January 1, 2019
2018-08-07SenateGovernor Approved
2018-06-28SenateSent to the Governor
2018-05-30SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro
2018-05-30SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Thomas Cullerton
2018-05-30SenatePassed Both Houses
2018-05-30SenateSenate Concurs
2018-05-30SenateHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 052-003-000
2018-05-29SenateHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Agriculture; 010-000-000
2018-05-28SenateHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Agriculture
2018-05-25SenateHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments
2018-05-25SenateHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Linda Holmes
2018-05-25SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 - May 28, 2018
2018-05-25SenateSecretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1
2018-05-24HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 107-000-000
2018-05-24HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. David S. Olsen
2018-05-22SenateChief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Linda Holmes
2018-05-21HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-21HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-18HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-17HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Allen Skillicorn
2018-05-17HouseDo Pass as Amended / Short Debate Executive Committee; 009-000-000
2018-05-17HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Executive Committee; by Voice Vote
2018-05-16HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Executive Committee
2018-05-15HouseIn line by 3PM. Timely filed in accordance with House Rule 18(e).
2018-05-15HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-05-15HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Sara Feigenholtz
2018-05-02HouseAssigned to Executive Committee
2018-04-24HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-04-24HouseFirst Reading
2018-04-24HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Sara Feigenholtz
2018-04-24HouseArrived in House
2018-04-24SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a)
2018-04-24SenateThird Reading - Passed; 053-000-000
2018-04-23SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 24, 2018
2018-04-23SenateSecond Reading
2018-04-19SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 23, 2018
2018-04-19SenateDo Pass as Amended Agriculture; 008-000-000
2018-04-19SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 2 Adopted
2018-04-19SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Agriculture
2018-04-17SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Agriculture
2018-04-13SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
2018-04-13SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Jil Tracy
2018-04-13SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 27, 2018
2018-04-12SenatePostponed - Agriculture
2018-04-12SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Agriculture
2018-03-01SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Agriculture
2018-03-01SenatePostponed - Agriculture
2018-02-28SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes
2018-02-28SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2018-02-28SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Jil Tracy
2018-01-24SenateAssigned to Agriculture
2018-01-10SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-01-10SenateFirst Reading
2018-01-10SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Jil Tracy

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
51058Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2270&GAID=14&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=91&GA=100
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB2270.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB2270eng.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB2270enr.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/publicacts/100/100-0740.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB2270sam001.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB2270sam002.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB2270ham001.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/100/senate/10000SB2270_04242018_038000T.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/100/house/10000SB2270_05242018_011000T.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/100/senate/10000SB2270ham001_05302018_017000C.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback