IL SB2269 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Identification Card Act and the Illinois Vehicle Code. Provides that the Secretary of State shall not provide facial recognition search services or photographs obtained in the process of issuing an identification card or a driver's license or permit to any federal, State, or local law enforcement agency or other governmental entity for the purpose of enforcing federal immigration laws. Effective immediately.
Title
SOS-FACIAL RECOGNITION INFO
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-13 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Celina Villanueva |
2020-01-20 | Senate | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Don Harmon |
2020-01-01 | Senate | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. John J. Cullerton |
2019-10-28 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-10-28 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-10-28 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Martin A. Sandoval |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
15 | 335 | 11 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
625 | 5 | 6-110.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2269&GAID=15&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/SB/10100SB2269.htm |