IL SB2269 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 25-8)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-05-09 - Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Emil Jones, III
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Makes appropriations to various agencies for prior year costs for personal services and State contributions to Social Security. Effective immediately .

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

$PRIOR YEAR-PERSONAL SERVICES

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-09SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Emil Jones, III
2018-05-03SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes
2018-05-01SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Dale Fowler
2018-04-26SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison
2018-04-25SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy
2018-04-25SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Jil Tracy
2018-04-25SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Martin A. Sandoval
2018-04-24SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Antonio Muñoz
2018-04-24SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Jason A. Barickman
2018-04-23SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Paul Schimpf
2018-04-18SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael E. Hastings
2018-04-17SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 18, 2018
2018-04-17SenateSecond Reading
2018-04-13SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Chapin Rose
2018-04-12SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 17, 2018
2018-04-12SenateDo Pass Appropriations II; 014-002-000
2018-03-01SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. David Koehler
2018-02-15SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Don Harmon
2018-02-15SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Pat McGuire
2018-02-14SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Melinda Bush
2018-02-14SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter
2018-02-13SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Bill Cunningham
2018-02-07SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford
2018-02-07SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Tim Bivins
2018-02-07SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Terry Link
2018-02-06SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Daniel Biss
2018-02-06SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez
2018-02-06SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Kwame Raoul
2018-01-31SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Omar Aquino
2018-01-31SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. John G. Mulroe
2018-01-31SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt
2018-01-31SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins
2018-01-30SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro
2018-01-30SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Scott M. Bennett
2018-01-24SenateAssigned to Appropriations II
2018-01-16SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Neil Anderson
2018-01-10SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Wm. Sam McCann
2018-01-10SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-01-10SenateFirst Reading
2018-01-10SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Andy Manar

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback