IL SB2268 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 15 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-15 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0563
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 15 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-15 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0563
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the State Treasurer Act. Provides that the State Treasurer may accept contributions for ABLE accounts once the Internal Revenue Service has issued either interim guidance or final regulations (currently, only final regulations). Provides that ABLE accounts may also be established for residents of other states (currently, only residents of Illinois). Makes technical corrections. Effective immediately.
Title
ABLE ACCOUNTS-CLEAN UP
Sponsors
Sen. Scott Bennett [D] | Rep. Kelly Burke [D] | Rep. Jack Franks [D] | Rep. Carol Ammons [D] |
Rep. Linda LaVia [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-05-11 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-04-12 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-12 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-07-15 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0563 |
2016-07-15 | Senate | Effective Date July 15, 2016 |
2016-07-15 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2016-06-09 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2016-05-11 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2016-05-11 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia |
2016-05-11 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons |
2016-05-11 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Jack D. Franks |
2016-05-11 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 114-000-000 |
2016-05-10 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2016-05-10 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2016-05-05 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2016-05-05 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Revenue & Finance Committee; 010-000-000 |
2016-05-05 | House | Remains in Revenue & Finance Committee |
2016-05-05 | House | Recommends Do Pass Subcommittee/ Revenue & Finance Committee; 006-000-000 |
2016-04-27 | House | To Income Tax Subcommittee |
2016-04-18 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2016-04-14 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2016-04-14 | House | First Reading |
2016-04-14 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Burke |
2016-04-12 | House | Arrived in House |
2016-04-12 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 052-000-000 |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 3, 2016 |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Second Reading |
2016-02-18 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 1, 2016 |
2016-02-18 | Senate | Do Pass State Government and Veterans Affairs; 006-000-000 |
2016-02-03 | Senate | Assigned to State Government and Veterans Affairs |
2016-01-27 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2016-01-27 | Senate | First Reading |
2016-01-27 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Scott M. Bennett |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
15 | 505 | 16.6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |