IL SB2267 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Highway Code. Provides that, upon determining that centerline striping or shoulder striping of a highway is necessary for the safety and welfare of highway users and the public, the highway authority of that highway may, with the approval of the Department of Transportation, utilize State funds, including, but not limited to, funds granted through the federal State Highway Safety Program, to conduct the striping. Effective immediately.
Title
HGHWY CD-STRIPING-STATE FUNDS
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-26 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-09 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2018-05-18 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2018-05-07 | House | Assigned to Transportation: Regulation, Roads & Bridges Committee |
2018-04-26 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-04-26 | House | First Reading |
2018-04-26 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Tim Butler |
2018-04-26 | House | Arrived in House |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 051-000-000 |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 24, 2018 |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Second Reading |
2018-04-11 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 12, 2018 |
2018-04-11 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Transportation; 011-000-000 |
2018-04-11 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2018-04-04 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Transportation |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Wm. Sam McCann |
2018-01-24 | Senate | Assigned to Transportation |
2017-11-09 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2017-11-09 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-11-09 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Wm. Sam McCann |