IL SB2267 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Criminal Code of 2012. Enhances the penalties for certain violations of the statutes concerning unlawful use of weapons, unlawful use or possession of weapons by felons, aggravated unlawful use of a weapon, and unlawful possession of a firearm by a street gang member. Provides that each circuit court shall transmit to every local law enforcement agency located within the circuit, on a quarterly basis, the disposition of all cases involving violations of the Deadly Weapons Article of the Code within the previous quarter. Amends the Unified Code of Corrections. Provides that a prisoner serving a sentence for certain unlawful use of weapons violations, unlawful use or possession of a weapon by felons, aggravated unlawful use of a weapon, or unlawful possession of a firearm by a street gang member shall receive no more than 4.5 days of sentence credit for each month of his or her sentence of imprisonment. Effective immediately.
Title
CRIM CD-FIREARM OFFENSES
Sponsors
Sen. Antonio Munoz [D] | Sen. Jacqueline Collins [D] | Sen. Iris Martinez [D] | Sen. Kimberly Lightford [D] |
Sen. Michael Hastings [D] | Sen. Heather Steans [D] | Sen. William Delgado [D] | Sen. Martin Sandoval [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-01-13 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2013-10-11 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Martin A. Sandoval |
2013-03-22 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2013-03-20 | Senate | Postponed - Subcommittee on CLEAR Compliance |
2013-03-13 | Senate | To Subcommittee on CLEAR Compliance |
2013-03-11 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. William Delgado |
2013-03-06 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Heather A. Steans |
2013-03-06 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael E. Hastings |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Assigned to Criminal Law |
2013-02-27 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2013-02-15 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2013-02-15 | Senate | First Reading |
2013-02-15 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Antonio Muñoz |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
720 | 5 | 24-1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
720 | 5 | 24-1.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
720 | 5 | 24-1.6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
720 | 5 | 24-1.8 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
720 | 5 | 24-11 | New Code | See Bill Text |
730 | 5 | 3-6-3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
730 | 5 | 5-5-3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2267&GAID=12&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=85&GA=98 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/98/SB/09800SB2267.htm |