IL SB2266 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on November 8 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-05-03 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the State Officials and Employees Ethics Act. Provides that on and after the effective date of this amendatory Act, appointments to the Legislative Ethics Commission shall be gender-balanced. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

LEGIS ETHICS CM-GENDER BALANCE

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-03SenateRule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2018-04-27SenateRule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 3, 2018
2018-04-13SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 27, 2018
2018-01-30SenateTo Subcommittee on Special Issues (EX)
2018-01-24SenateAssigned to Executive
2018-01-18SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison
2017-12-05SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt
2017-11-08SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-11-08SenateFirst Reading
2017-11-08SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Cristina Castro

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
543025-5Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback