IL SB2263 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 31 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-05-15 - Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Creates the Data Privacy Act. Provides for the regulation of the use and sale of data. Defines terms. Establishes consumer rights to copies of information held by persons who control and process data. Provides for the correction of inaccurate data. Provides for restrictions on the use of personal data. Provides for the enforcement of the Act by the Attorney General. Provides civil penalties. Preempts home rule and provides that the regulation of data use and privacy are exclusive powers and functions of the State. Creates the Consumer Privacy Fund as a special fund in the State treasury. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

DATA PRIVACY ACT

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-05-15SenateRule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2020
2020-05-07SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading/Passage Deadline Established As May 29, 2020
2020-05-07SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 22, 2020
2020-04-30SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading/Passage Deadline Established As May 22, 2020
2020-04-30SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 15, 2020
2020-04-23SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading/Passage Deadline Established As May 15, 2020
2020-04-23SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 7, 2020
2020-04-16SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 30, 2020
2020-04-12SenatePursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
2020-03-25SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading/Passage Deadline Established As May 7, 2020
2020-03-25SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 24, 2020
2020-03-18SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 2, 2020
2020-02-27SenateAssigned to Judiciary
2019-05-31SenateReferred to Assignments
2019-05-31SenateFirst Reading
2019-05-31SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Don Harmon

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
301055.891New CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback