IL SB2262 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on November 7 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-07-01 - Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Public Aid Code. Provides that with respect to Managed Care Organization (MCO) contracts entered into between MCOs and providers of durable medical equipment and supplies, MCO in-network contracted fees paid to those providers shall at least be equal to the fee-for-service durable medical equipment fee schedule published on the Department of Healthcare and Family Services' website. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

MCO-DURABLE MEDICAL EQUIPMENT

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-07-01SenatePursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
2018-04-27SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 3, 2018
2018-04-26SenatePlaced on Calendar - Consideration Postponed May 1, 2018
2018-04-26SenateThird Reading - Consideration Postponed
2018-04-26SenateVerified
2018-04-24SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 25, 2018
2018-04-24SenateSecond Reading
2018-02-21SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading February 22, 2018
2018-02-21SenateDo Pass Human Services; 006-003-000
2018-01-24SenateAssigned to Human Services
2017-11-07SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-11-07SenateFirst Reading
2017-11-07SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. David Koehler

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
30555-30Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback