IL SB2260 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 11-7)
Status: Engrossed on April 11 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-05-18 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the State Revenue Sharing Act. Provides that, in fiscal year 2018, each school district having Personal Property Tax Replacement Fund receipts totaling 13% or more of its total revenues in fiscal year 2016 shall receive an additional amount equal to 11% of the total amount distributed to the school district from the Personal Property Tax Replacement Fund during fiscal year 2016. Requires the State Board of Education to identify those school districts to the Department of Revenue. Provides that the total amount of additional distributions shall not exceed $4,353,136. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

REVENUE-SCHOOL DISTRICTS

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-11 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-18HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2018-05-17HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Thaddeus Jones
2018-05-15HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael D. Unes
2018-04-26HouseAssigned to Revenue & Finance Committee
2018-04-16HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jay Hoffman
2018-04-12HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Wojcicki Jimenez
2018-04-12HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond
2018-04-12HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Terri Bryant
2018-04-11HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-04-11HouseFirst Reading
2018-04-11HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Daniel J. Burke
2018-04-11HouseArrived in House
2018-04-11SenateThird Reading - Passed; 055-000-000
2018-03-13SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. James F. Clayborne, Jr.
2018-03-01SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Sue Rezin
2018-03-01SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Kyle McCarter
2018-03-01SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Wm. Sam McCann
2018-01-30SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading January 31, 2018
2018-01-30SenateSecond Reading
2018-01-30SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading January 30, 2018
2018-01-30SenateDo Pass Education; 011-000-000
2018-01-24SenateAssigned to Education
2018-01-09SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Chapin Rose
2017-11-08SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. William R. Haine
2017-11-07SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Paul Schimpf
2017-11-07SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Pat McGuire
2017-11-02SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. David Koehler
2017-11-01SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Neil Anderson
2017-11-01SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-11-01SenateFirst Reading
2017-11-01SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Jil Tracy

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
3011511.2New CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback