IL SB2259 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Income Tax Act. Creates a credit for taxpayers who (1) have an adjusted gross income of $200,000 or less and (2) are college or university students or may claim a college or university student as a dependent. Provides that the credit shall be equal to a portion of the tuition and fee expenses paid by the taxpayer during the taxable year on behalf of the qualifying student. Sets forth the amount of the credit. Effective immediately.
Title
INC TX-EDUCATION CREDIT
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-09 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2018-05-31 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2018-05-15 | Senate | Re-assigned to Revenue |
2018-05-11 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2018 |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2018-04-27 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 3, 2018 |
2018-04-13 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 27, 2018 |
2018-01-24 | Senate | Assigned to Revenue |
2017-12-06 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael E. Hastings |
2017-11-30 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Melinda Bush |
2017-11-30 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt |
2017-11-30 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Napoleon Harris, III |
2017-11-30 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro |
2017-11-30 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2017-11-30 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Antonio Muñoz |
2017-11-29 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Scott M. Bennett |
2017-11-29 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Thomas Cullerton |
2017-11-29 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford |
2017-11-01 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2017-11-01 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-11-01 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Laura M. Murphy |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
35 | 5 | 201 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2259&GAID=14&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB2259.htm |