IL SB2258 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Introduced on November 1 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-04-13 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Municipal Auditing Law of the Illinois Municipal Code. Provides that audit reports reporting on the financial position and results of financial operations for each fund of the municipality shall be consistent with either the accrual or cash basis of accounting depending upon the system followed by each municipality and shall otherwise be in accordance with generally accepted accounting principles (currently, shall be in accordance with generally accepted accounting principles, insofar as possible).

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

MUNI CD-AUDIT REPORT STANDARDS

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-13SenateRule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2018-04-11SenatePostponed - Local Government
2018-03-14SenatePostponed - Local Government
2018-03-01SenateAssigned to Local Government
2018-02-26SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Steven M. Landek
2018-02-07SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Pamela J. Althoff
2018-01-29SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Andy Manar
2018-01-16SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Chuck Weaver
2018-01-03SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Chapin Rose
2017-11-27SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jason A. Barickman
2017-11-01SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-11-01SenateFirst Reading
2017-11-01SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Dale A. Righter

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
6558-8-5Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback