IL SB2258 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Municipal Auditing Law of the Illinois Municipal Code. Provides that audit reports reporting on the financial position and results of financial operations for each fund of the municipality shall be consistent with either the accrual or cash basis of accounting depending upon the system followed by each municipality and shall otherwise be in accordance with generally accepted accounting principles (currently, shall be in accordance with generally accepted accounting principles, insofar as possible).
Title
MUNI CD-AUDIT REPORT STANDARDS
Sponsors
Sen. Dale Righter [R] | Sen. Jason Barickman [R] | Sen. Chapin Rose [R] | Sen. Chuck Weaver [R] |
Sen. Andy Manar [D] | Sen. Pamela Althoff [R] | Sen. Steven Landek [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-09 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2018-04-13 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2018-04-11 | Senate | Postponed - Local Government |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Postponed - Local Government |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Assigned to Local Government |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Steven M. Landek |
2018-02-07 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Pamela J. Althoff |
2018-01-29 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Andy Manar |
2018-01-16 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Chuck Weaver |
2018-01-03 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Chapin Rose |
2017-11-27 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jason A. Barickman |
2017-11-01 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2017-11-01 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-11-01 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Dale A. Righter |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
65 | 5 | 8-8-5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2258&GAID=14&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB2258.htm |