IL SB2254 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-5)
Status: Enrolled on May 17 2018 - 75% progression
Action: 2018-06-15 - Sent to the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the State Commemorative Dates Act. Designates May 17th of each year as Diffuse Intrinsic Pontine Glioma (DIPG) Awareness Day to be observed throughout the State as a day to encourage the people of Illinois to help increase public awareness of this particularly aggressive form of cancer affecting children.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

DIPG AWARENESS DAY

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-17 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 111 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-04-11 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-15SenateSent to the Governor
2018-05-22SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt
2018-05-21SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro
2018-05-17HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Patricia R. Bellock
2018-05-17HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Brian W. Stewart
2018-05-17HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia
2018-05-17SenatePassed Both Houses
2018-05-17HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 111-000-000
2018-05-16HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-16HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-10HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Sente
2018-05-10HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Al Riley
2018-05-10HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-09HouseDo Pass / Short Debate State Government Administration Committee; 007-000-000
2018-04-27HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit
2018-04-27HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Terri Bryant
2018-04-26HouseAssigned to State Government Administration Committee
2018-04-18HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Avery Bourne
2018-04-18HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Frances Ann Hurley
2018-04-11HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-04-11HouseFirst Reading
2018-04-11HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Dave Severin
2018-04-11HouseArrived in House
2018-04-11SenateThird Reading - Passed; 056-000-000
2018-02-20SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading February 21, 2018
2018-02-20SenateSecond Reading
2018-01-30SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading January 30, 2018
2018-01-30SenateDo Pass State Government; 006-000-000
2018-01-24SenateAssigned to State Government
2017-11-01SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-11-01SenateFirst Reading
2017-11-01SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Andy Manar

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
5490133New CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback