IL SB2252 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-5)
Status: Engrossed on April 26 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-05-18 - Remains in Personnel & Pensions Committee
Pending: House Personnel & Pensions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the State Police Act. Provides that preference for the hiring of a Department of State Police officer shall be given to the son, daughter, stepson, stepdaughter, grandson, granddaughter, brother, or sister of a law enforcement officer who was killed in the line of duty. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

PREFERENCE HIRING STATE POLICE

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-26 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-18HouseRemains in Personnel & Pensions Committee
2018-05-18HouseMotion Do Pass - Lost Personnel & Pensions Committee; 004-004-005
2018-05-15HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Frances Ann Hurley
2018-05-10HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie Phelps Finnie
2018-05-07HouseAssigned to Personnel & Pensions Committee
2018-05-01HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Sam Yingling
2018-05-01HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy
2018-05-01HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart
2018-04-26HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-04-26HouseFirst Reading
2018-04-26HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Michael Halpin
2018-04-26HouseArrived in House
2018-04-26SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a)
2018-04-26SenateThird Reading - Passed; 050-000-000
2018-04-26SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
2018-04-26SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Muñoz
2018-04-26SenateRecalled to Second Reading
2018-04-19SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Postponed - State Government
2018-04-12SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt State Government; 007-000-000
2018-04-12SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Postponed - State Government
2018-04-10SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to State Government
2018-04-09SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
2018-04-09SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Antonio Muñoz
2018-04-04SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Postponed - State Government
2018-03-01SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Postponed - State Government
2018-02-22SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading February 27, 2018
2018-02-22SenateSecond Reading
2018-02-21SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Postponed - State Government
2018-02-08SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-8(b-1) - Referred to State Government
2018-02-01SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael E. Hastings
2018-02-01SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Neil Anderson
2018-02-01SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Paul Schimpf
2018-02-01SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2018-02-01SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Antonio Muñoz
2018-01-31SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Chris Nybo
2018-01-31SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. John F. Curran
2018-01-30SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Tim Bivins
2018-01-30SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading January 30, 2018
2018-01-30SenateDo Pass State Government; 006-000-000
2018-01-24SenateAssigned to State Government
2017-10-25SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-10-25SenateFirst Reading
2017-10-25SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Antonio Muñoz

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
2026109Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback