IL SB2250 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on August 20 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-20 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0549
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on August 20 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-20 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0549
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Department of Veterans' Affairs Act. Provides that each administrator of an Illinois Veterans Home who has an established locally-held member's benefits fund shall prepare and submit to the Department of Veterans' Affairs a monthly report of all donations received, including donations of a nonmonetary nature. Provides that the report shall include the end of month balance of the locally-held member's benefits fund. Provides that the Department shall prepare a quarterly report on all locally-held member's benefits funds from each Illinois Veterans Home. Provides that the report shall contain the amount of donations received for each veterans' home, including monetary and nonmonetary items, the expenditures and items dispersed, and the end of quarter balance of the locally-held member's benefits funds. Provides that the Department shall submit the quarterly report to the General Assembly and to the Governor and publish the report on its website.
Title
VET BENEFIT FUND REPORTING
Sponsors
Sen. Susan Rezin [R] | Sen. Craig Wilcox [R] | Sen. Dan McConchie [R] | Sen. Dale Fowler [R] |
Rep. Stephanie Kifowit [D] | Rep. Lance Yednock [D] | Rep. Tom Weber [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-05-26 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-23 - Senate - Motion in Senate (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-23 - Senate - Motion in Senate (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-08-20 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0549 |
2021-08-20 | Senate | Effective Date January 1, 2022 |
2021-08-20 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2021-06-24 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2021-05-26 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2021-05-26 | House | Third Reading - Consent Calendar - Passed 112-000-000 |
2021-05-21 | House | Third Reading - Consent Calendar - First Day |
2021-05-14 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-05-14 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Tom Weber |
2021-05-13 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-05-13 | House | Second Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-05-12 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-05-11 | House | Do Pass / Consent Calendar Veterans' Affairs Committee; 006-000-000 |
2021-05-04 | House | Assigned to Veterans' Affairs Committee |
2021-05-03 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Lance Yednock |
2021-04-27 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-04-27 | House | First Reading |
2021-04-26 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit |
2021-04-26 | House | Arrived in House |
2021-04-23 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 058-000-000 |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading ** April 21, 2021 |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Second Reading |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Dale Fowler |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 15, 2021 |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Do Pass Veterans Affairs; 005-000-000 |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Assigned to Veterans Affairs |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Dan McConchie |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Craig Wilcox |
2021-02-26 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2021-02-26 | Senate | First Reading |
2021-02-26 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Sue Rezin |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
20 | 2805 | 2.01a | Amended Code | Citation Text |
20 | 2805 | 2.04 | Amended Code | Citation Text |