IL SB2249 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Introduced on April 9 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-05-23 - Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Creates the Access to Justice Grant Program Act. Establishes a Program and a Panel to issue and award grants to 2 community-based organizations to increase outreach, education on legal matters, and access to legal services to low-income communities of color. Requires the organizations to act as fiscal agents. Provides for the recruitment and training of community navigators to conduct legal screenings. Requires the Governor to include a $10,000,000 appropriation for the Program in the annual State budget. Contains provisions concerning: grant application requirements; a grant review committee; financial audits; and other matters. Amends the Children and Family Services Act. Provides that, if a child is placed in the custody or guardianship of the Department of Children and Family Services or a child is returned to the custody of a parent or guardian and the court retains jurisdiction of the case, the Department must ensure that the child is up to date on well-child visits, including immunizations, or there is a documented religious or medical reason the child is not immunized. Requires the Department to complete, before a child's discharge from foster or substitute care, a home safety checklist regarding the child's home. Requires any aftercare services to a child and his or her family to start on the date the child is returned to the custody or guardianship of the parent or guardian. Amends the Abused and Neglected Child Reporting Act. Provides that when a report is made by a mandated reporter and there is a prior indicated report of abuse or neglect and a prior open service case involving a member of the household, the Department must accept the report as a child welfare services referral. Requires the Auditor General to conduct performance audits on the Department. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

ACCESS TO JUSTICE/DCFS

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-23SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt
2019-05-15SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Napoleon Harris, III
2019-04-30SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Christopher Belt
2019-04-12SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Emil Jones, III
2019-04-11SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez
2019-04-11SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson
2019-04-11SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Antonio Muñoz
2019-04-11SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins
2019-04-10SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter
2019-04-10SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter
2019-04-10SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro
2019-04-10SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Ram Villivalam
2019-04-10SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Omar Aquino
2019-04-10SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Robert Peters
2019-04-09SenateReferred to Assignments
2019-04-09SenateFirst Reading
2019-04-09SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
205057.8New CodeSee Bill Text
32557.01New CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback