IL SB2247 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Criminal Code of 2012 concerning unlawful use of weapons. Provides that 120 days after the effective date of the bill, it is unlawful for a person to knowingly import, sell, manufacture, transfer, or possess, in this State, a bump-fire stock for a semi-automatic firearm that does not convert the semi-automatic firearm into a machine gun. Defines "bump-fire stock" as a butt stock designed to be attached to a semi-automatic firearm and designed, made, or altered, and intended to increase the rate of fire achievable with the firearm to that of a fully automatic firearm by using the energy from the recoil of the firearm to generate reciprocating action that facilitates repeated activation of the trigger. Provides that a violation is a Class 4 felony. Effective immediately.
Title
CRIM CD-BAN BUMP-FIRE STOCK
Sponsors
Sen. Bill Brady [R] | Sen. John Curran [R] | Sen. Tom Rooney [R] | Sen. Karen McConnaughay [R] |
Sen. Susan Rezin [R] | Sen. Michael Connelly [R] | Sen. Jim Oberweis [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-09 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2018-11-15 | Senate | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. William E. Brady |
2018-04-27 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2018-04-17 | Senate | Postponed - Judiciary |
2018-04-13 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 27, 2018 |
2018-04-12 | Senate | Waive Posting Notice |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Jim Oberweis |
2018-01-24 | Senate | Assigned to Judiciary |
2017-11-01 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael Connelly |
2017-10-24 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2017-10-24 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-10-24 | Senate | Co-Sponsor Sen. Sue Rezin |
2017-10-24 | Senate | Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Karen McConnaughay |
2017-10-24 | Senate | Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Tom Rooney |
2017-10-24 | Senate | Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. John F. Curran |
2017-10-24 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Chris Nybo |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
720 | 5 | 24-1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2247&GAID=14&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB2247.htm |