IL SB2246 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 21 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-05-21 - House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Executive Committee
Pending: House Executive Committee
Hearing: May 28 @ 12:00 pm in Room 118
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the School Code. Provides that township land commissioners or trustees of schools that have title to any school real estate or lands may authorize by resolution the sale of common school lands to a government entity if two-thirds of the township land commissioners or trustees of schools approve the resolution. Provides that the regional superintendent of schools of the county in which the lands are located shall complete the sale and deliver a certificate of purchase to the government entity. Provides that a government entity that purchases common school lands, or its assigns, may obtain a copy of a certificate of purchase or patent by (1) for a certificate of purchase, filing an affidavit with the regional superintendent in which the lands are located proving the loss or destruction of the original; (2) for a patent, filing an affidavit with the Secretary of State proving loss or destruction of the original; and (3) presenting a copy of the certified resolution approving the sale that has been filed by the township land commissioners or trustees of schools with the county recorder of deeds to the regional superintendent or Secretary of State. Provides that the regional superintendent or the Secretary of State shall issue a replacement certificate or patent, which shall have the effect of the originals and shall reflect the effective date of the transfer of title as the date of the filing of the resolution by the township land commissioners or trustees of schools with the county recorder of deeds. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

SCH CD-SCHOOL LAND-GOVT ENTITY

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-02-21 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-21HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Executive Committee
2018-05-18HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 25, 2018
2018-05-18HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-05-18HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. David A. Welter
2018-05-14HouseAssigned to Executive Committee
2018-02-27HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-02-27HouseFirst Reading
2018-02-22HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. David A. Welter
2018-02-21HouseArrived in House
2018-02-21SenateThird Reading - Passed; 050-000-000
2018-02-08SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading February 13, 2018
2018-02-08SenateSecond Reading
2018-02-07SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading
2018-02-07SenateDo Pass Judiciary; 008-000-000
2018-01-24SenateAssigned to Judiciary
2017-10-24SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-10-24SenateFirst Reading
2017-10-24SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Sue Rezin

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
105515-18Amended CodeCitation Text
105515-7.5New CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback