IL SB2244 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-4)
Status: Enrolled on May 30 2021 - 75% progression
Action: 2021-06-28 - Sent to the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Senior Citizens Real Estate Tax Deferral Act. Provides that the income limitation under the Act is $65,000 for tax years 2022 through 2025 and $55,000 for tax year 2026 and thereafter (currently, $55,000). Provides that, for tax years 2022 through 2025, the total amount of any such deferral shall not exceed $7,500 per taxpayer in each tax year (currently, $5,000). Provides that, beginning again in tax year 2026, the total amount of any such deferral shall not exceed $5,000. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

PROP TX-SENIOR FREEZE-INCOME

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-30 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-27 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-21 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 55 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-28SenateSent to the Governor
2021-05-31SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Rachelle Crowe
2021-05-30SenatePassed Both Houses
2021-05-30SenateSenate Concurs
2021-05-30SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 058-000-000
2021-05-30SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Dave Syverson
2021-05-30SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins
2021-05-30SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Ann Gillespie
2021-05-30SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Revenue; 008-000-000
2021-05-29SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Revenue
2021-05-28SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments
2021-05-28SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Laura M. Murphy
2021-05-27SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 - May 28, 2021
2021-05-27SenateSecretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1
2021-05-27HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Vella
2021-05-27HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. William Davis
2021-05-27HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Suzanne Ness
2021-05-27HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Dagmara Avelar
2021-05-27HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah
2021-05-27HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Sue Scherer
2021-05-27HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Bradley Stephens
2021-05-27HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Chris Bos
2021-05-27HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Andrew S. Chesney
2021-05-27HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood
2021-05-27HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan
2021-05-27HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Frances Ann Hurley
2021-05-27HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford
2021-05-27HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 117-000-000
2021-05-26HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Jennifer Gong-Gershowitz
2021-05-25HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2021-05-25HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2021-05-25HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2021-05-20HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Revenue & Finance Committee; 017-000-000
2021-05-20HouseAlternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Debbie Meyers-Martin
2021-05-19HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Revenue & Finance Committee
2021-05-17HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2021-05-17HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Zalewski
2021-05-13HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2021-05-13HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Revenue & Finance Committee; 015-000-001
2021-05-06HouseAlternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Michael J. Zalewski
2021-04-28HouseAssigned to Revenue & Finance Committee
2021-04-23HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2021-04-23HouseFirst Reading
2021-04-22SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Emil Jones, III
2021-04-22HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Frances Ann Hurley
2021-04-22HouseArrived in House
2021-04-21SenateThird Reading - Passed; 055-001-000
2021-04-21SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Thomas Cullerton
2021-04-21SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr.
2021-04-21SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter
2021-04-20SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 21, 2021
2021-04-20SenateSecond Reading
2021-04-15SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 20, 2021
2021-04-15SenateDo Pass as Amended Revenue; 008-000-000
2021-04-14SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2021-04-14SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Revenue
2021-04-14SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2021-04-14SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Laura M. Murphy
2021-04-07SenateAssigned to Revenue
2021-03-30SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Sara Feigenholtz
2021-02-26SenateReferred to Assignments
2021-02-26SenateFirst Reading
2021-02-26SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Laura M. Murphy

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
320302Amended CodeCitation Text
3520015-172Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback