IL SB2243 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on October 18 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-09-04 - Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. William E. Brady
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Counties Code. Provides that with the advice and consent of a majority of the county board, a county board chairman elected by the voters of the county may: (1) create standing committees; and (2) appoint members and chairpersons to standing committees.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

COUNTIES CD-CHAIRMAN-COMMITTEE

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-09-04SenateChief Sponsor Changed to Sen. William E. Brady
2018-04-13SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2018-04-13SenateRule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2018-02-07SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Local Government
2018-02-01SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2018-02-01SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Karen McConnaughay
2018-01-24SenateAssigned to Local Government
2017-10-18SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-10-18SenateFirst Reading
2017-10-18SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Karen McConnaughay

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
5552-1003.5New CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback