IL SB2239 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 26 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-04-23 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Prevention of Tobacco Use by Persons under 21 Years of Age and Sale and Distribution of Tobacco Products Act. Expands approved methods of age verification to include examining a government-issued photographic identification and performing age verification through enhanced controls that utilize a scanning technology or other automated, software-based system. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

TOBACCO PRODUCTS-AGE CHECK

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-23SenateRule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2021-04-16SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 23, 2021
2021-04-07SenateAssigned to Executive
2021-04-06SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins
2021-02-26SenateReferred to Assignments
2021-02-26SenateFirst Reading
2021-02-26SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Laura M. Murphy

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
7206751Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback