IL SB2237 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on October 18 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-07-01 - Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Appropriates $442,403 from the Snowmobile Trail Establishment Fund to the Department of Natural Resources for the administration and payment of grants to nonprofit snowmobile clubs and organizations for construction, maintenance, and rehabilitation of snowmobile trails and areas for the use of snowmobiles. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

$DNR-SNOWMOBILES

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-07-01SenatePursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
2018-01-24SenateAssigned to Appropriations II
2017-11-08SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Neil Anderson
2017-10-24SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Sue Rezin
2017-10-18SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-10-18SenateFirst Reading
2017-10-18SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Pamela J. Althoff

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback